Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Hacault

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1926BornBruxelles
20 May 195125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
30 Jul 196438.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
30 Jul 196438.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Media
8 Sep 196438.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Media
28 Oct 197246.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
28 Oct 197246.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Media
7 Sep 197448.6SucceededArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
13 Apr 200074.2DiedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Antoine Hacault:
Archbishop Antoine Hacault (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint-Boniface

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013