Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital-Justin Grandin, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Albert, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1829Born
23 Apr 185425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Dec 185728.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
11 Dec 185728.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
30 Nov 185930.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
22 Sep 187142.6AppointedBishop of Saint Albert, Alberta, Canada
3 Jun 190273.3DiedBishop of Saint Albert, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Vital-Justin Grandin (VIAF: 61596513)
Bishop Vital-Justin Grandin O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Albert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-la-Cour, Diocese of Mainz, Germany
Ordained BishopTrinite, Marseille, Diocese of Marseille, France

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017