Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Henri Jean Marie Prud’homme

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan

Titular Bishop of Saldae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1882BornSaint Boniface
9 Oct 190422.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 192138.8AppointedBishop of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
28 Oct 192139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
20 Feb 193754.4ResignedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
20 Feb 193754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
5 Jan 195269.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Henri Jean Marie Prud’homme:
Bishop Joseph Henri Jean Marie Prud’homme (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013