Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aimé Décosse

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1903BornSomerset
4 Jul 192623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
3 Nov 195350.4AppointedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
20 Jan 195450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
12 May 197369.9ResignedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
8 Jan 199187.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Aimé Décosse:
Bishop Aimé Décosse (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013