Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Émilius Goulet, P.S.S.

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1933 Born
24 Jun 195825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
196026.6IncardinatedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
23 Jun 200168.1AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
16 Sep 200168.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
3 Jul 200976.1RetiredArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Émilius Goulet
Archbishop Émilius Goulet P.S.S. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Isidore de Dorchester

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,047
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast