Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario L. Brodeur

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria in Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1889BornActon Vale
17 Jun 191626.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 194151.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
24 May 194151.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Midaëum
30 Jun 194151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midaëum
27 Jul 194151.7SucceededBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
15 Oct 196677.0ResignedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
15 Oct 196677.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronana
20 Jan 197181.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Maronana
7 Feb 198696.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Rosario L. Brodeur:
Bishop Rosario L. Brodeur (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria in Ontario

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013