Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lilongwe

Archidioecesis Lilongvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 February 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malawi
  • Square Kilometers: 24,025 (9,279 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 33, Lilongwe, Malawi
  • Telephone: 754.667
  • Fax: 752.767

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Nyassa
31 July 1889ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Nyassa (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyassa
12 February 1897ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Nyassa Vicariate Apostolic of Nyassa
3 December 1903Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Shiré (erected)
28 January 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Vicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo (erected)
1 July 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Jameson (erected)
8 May 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Nyassa (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Likuni
12 July 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Vicariate Apostolic of Likuni
29 April 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Likuni
Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba
Vicariate Apostolic of Dedza (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lilongwe
20 June 1958Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Likuni Vicariate Apostolic of Lilongwe
Diocese of Lilongwe
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lilongwe Diocese of Lilongwe
Archdiocese of Lilongwe
9 February 2011ElevatedDiocese of Lilongwe Archdiocese of Lilongwe

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyassa
195068,674500,00013.7%39391,760756ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Likuni
Vicariate Apostolic of Lilongwe
Diocese of Lilongwe
1970175,6141,200,00014.6%1155662,6607412616ap1971
1978257,1791,627,17915.8%1549644,0186210222ap1981
1990482,4922,511,00019.2%3258905,3617015825ap1991
1999446,4884,000,00011.2%4251934,8006221032ap2000
2000567,3954,000,00014.2%4150916,2356121532ap2001
2001561,3953,630,00015.5%4051916,1696722433ap2002
2002595,3953,993,00014.9%3652886,7656923833ap2003
2003598,8003,997,00015.0%3952916,5806924433ap2004
2004774,7604,068,00019.0%60521126,9176126333ap2005
Archdiocese of Lilongwe

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013