Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chipata

Dioecesis Chipatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 15 April 1968
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lusaka
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 69,106 (26,692 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofchipata.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 510103, Chipata, Zambia
  • Telephone: (062)21.375
  • Fax: 21.551

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Jameson
1 July 1937ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Jameson (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Jameson
7 May 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort Jameson Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Jameson
Diocese of Fort Jameson
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fort Jameson Diocese of Fort Jameson
Diocese of Chipata
15 April 1968Name ChangedDiocese of Fort Jameson Diocese of Chipata

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Jameson
195031,586225,56014.0%325281,12810ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort Jameson
Diocese of Fort Jameson
Diocese of Chipata
197088,922509,00017.5%940491,8145142ap1971
1980120,886609,00019.8%944532,280545017ap1981
1990176,353669,68626.3%1338513,4574810919ap1991
1999253,9001,273,75219.9%2533584,3774413421ap2000
2000263,8741,273,75220.7%2722495,3853313521ap2001
2001274,0071,480,96718.5%2521465,9563814121ap2002
2002281,2651,300,77321.6%2324475,9843513422ap2003
2003285,7601,300,97322.0%2321446,4943214222ap2004
2004285,7601,300,97322.0%2522476,0803814523ap2005
2006315,1301,381,00022.8%2922516,1793514923ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 30 Aug 2013