Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Blantyre

Archidioecesis Blantyrensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas Luke Msusa, S.M.M., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malawi
  • Square Kilometers: 9,166 (3,540 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 385, Blantyre, Malawi
  • Telephone: (1)63.79.05
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Shiré
3 December 1903ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Shiré (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Shiré
14 April 1908ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Shiré Vicariate Apostolic of Shiré
15 May 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Shiré Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Blantyre
15 May 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Shiré Vicariate Apostolic of Blantyre
Archdiocese of Blantyre
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Blantyre Archdiocese of Blantyre
22 March 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Blantyre Diocese of Chikwawa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Shiré
1950208,7831,120,00018.6%2069892,345610219ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Blantyre
Archdiocese of Blantyre
1970300,807965,96031.1%2547724,1778315133ap1971
1980414,0001,418,00029.2%3242745,5947517840ap1981
1990562,5122,356,00023.9%47781254,50011117144ap1991
1999744,9653,900,00019.1%6819878,5626416946ap2000
2000741,2684,002,00018.5%6719868,6196617245ap2001
2001752,3914,000,00018.8%6717848,9576214246ap2002
2002762,1394,000,00019.1%64851495,11512215048ap2003
2003791,6224,072,00019.4%6617839,5373715646ap2004
2004972,4884,145,00023.5%62188012,1566733938ap2005
20061,008,1604,370,00023.1%57197613,2658221137ap2007
20121,539,2095,166,00029.8%78159316,5504334137ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013