Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Augustine Kalilombe, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1933BornMua
3 Feb 195824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
6 May 197238.7AppointedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
27 Aug 197239.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
20 Dec 197946.3ResignedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
25 Sep 201279.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Patrick Augustine Kalilombe:
Bishop Patrick Augustine Kalilombe M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013