Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kalemie-Kirungu

Dioecesis Kalemiensis-Kirunguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1972
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 71,577 (27,646 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 475, Kalemie, Shaba, Rep. Democratique du Congo

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}
11 January 1887ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
11 July 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore} Vicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
10 January 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasongo (erected)
Diocese of Baudouinville
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville Diocese of Baudouinville
24 April 1971Territory LostDiocese of Baudouinville
Diocese of Kilwa
Diocese of Kongolo
Diocese of Manono (erected)
Diocese of Kalemie-Kirungu
22 August 1972Name ChangedDiocese of Baudouinville Diocese of Kalemie-Kirungu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
195079,992450,00017.8%22598198797317ap1951
Diocese of Baudouinville
195995,784322,88529.7%1750671,429238714ap1960
1969123,049392,82231.3%2044641,922758816ap1971
Diocese of Kalemie-Kirungu
1980136,600401,78034.0%829373,6914657ap1981
1990184,487426,00043.3%1321345,426396231ap1991
1997482,130975,69349.4%3913529,271286825ap2003
2003560,132980,70057.1%527599,493217627ap2004
2004562,200980,00057.4%517589,693177830ap2005
2006595,0001,038,00057.3%556619,754127732ap2007
2008660,0001,155,00057.1%814857,764107232ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013