Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Harare

Archidioecesis Hararensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 25 June 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 63,555 (24,548 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 66 Fifth St., P.O. Box CY 330, Causeway, Harare, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (07)92.125
  • Fax: 21.598

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Zambese
2 July 1879ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Mission "Sui Iuris" of Zambese (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Zambese
9 March 1915ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Zambese Prefecture Apostolic of Zambese
14 July 1927Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Zambese Prefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Salisbury
14 July 1927Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Zambese Prefecture Apostolic of Salisbury
4 January 1931Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Salisbury Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bulawayo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
3 March 1931ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Salisbury Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
2 February 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Umtali (erected)
29 June 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Wankie (erected)
Archdiocese of Salisbury
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Salisbury Archdiocese of Salisbury
17 December 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Salisbury Prefecture Apostolic of Sinoia (erected)
Archdiocese of Harare
25 June 1982Name ChangedArchdiocese of Salisbury Archdiocese of Harare

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
195044,2791,023,5674.3%2808253927308ap1951
Archdiocese of Salisbury
1970176,2422,085,9108.4%211371581,11518848223ap1971
1980209,1872,197,8449.5%28911191,7571334679ap1981
Archdiocese of Harare
1990254,8353,211,3347.9%34771112,2951084233ap1991
1999363,0274,392,5688.3%421121542,3572413973ap2000
2000400,5864,515,5788.9%411101512,6522534113ap2001
2001452,4684,642,0149.7%36961323,4272153953ap2002
2002369,7714,443,4278.3%37961332,78023327341ap2003
2003379,2914,771,8387.9%39901292,94022335143ap2004
2004483,2934,866,0009.9%38861243,89729535043ap2005
2006499,8104,936,00010.1%36981343,72927236543ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Aug 2012