Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rémi Joseph Gustave Sainte-Marie, M. Afr.

Archbishop Emeritus of Lilongwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1938 BornLa Minerve, Canada
29 Jun 196325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
14 Feb 199860.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dedza, Malawi
14 Feb 199860.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Molicunza
9 May 199860.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Molicunza
7 Sep 200062.6AppointedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
18 Feb 200668.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
4 Jul 200769.4SucceededBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
9 Feb 201173.0AppointedArchbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
3 Jul 201375.4RetiredArchbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Rémi Joseph Gustave Sainte-Marie:
Archbishop Rémi Joseph Gustave Sainte-Marie M. Afr. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lilongwe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lilongwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2006
  • s: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,275
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015