Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias A. Chimole

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1916BornNakhwala
21 Sep 194731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Zomba, Malawi
21 Sep 197054.7AppointedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
13 Dec 197054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zomba, Malawi
20 Dec 197963.9AppointedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
11 Nov 199478.8RetiredBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
18 Nov 200589.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Matthias A. Chimole:
Bishop Matthias A. Chimole (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015