Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mpika

Dioecesis Mpikaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Ignatius Chama, Apostolic Administrator

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 September 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kasama
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 120,000 (46,350 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diompika.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 450007, Mpika, Zambia
  • Telephone: (04)370.273
  • Fax: 370.112

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Lwangwa
23 May 1933ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Lwangwa (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lwangwa
1 July 1937ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Lwangwa Vicariate Apostolic of Lwangwa
Vicariate Apostolic of Abercorn
8 March 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Lwangwa Vicariate Apostolic of Abercorn
Diocese of Abercorn
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Abercorn Diocese of Abercorn
Diocese of Mbala
22 November 1967Name ChangedDiocese of Abercorn Diocese of Mbala
Diocese of Mbala-Mpika
26 April 1991Name ChangedDiocese of Mbala Diocese of Mbala-Mpika
Diocese of Mpika
9 September 1994Name ChangedDiocese of Mbala-Mpika Diocese of Mpika
29 October 2011Territory LostArchdiocese of Lusaka
Diocese of Mpika
Diocese of Kabwe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lwangwa
195039,153197,89119.8%128291,35049ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Abercorn
Diocese of Abercorn
195945,017274,12316.4%533381,1843191611ap1960
Diocese of Mbala
197063,980384,20716.7%1338511,2545038ap1971
198073,200367,00019.9%1226381,9263340ap1981
1990110,445545,00020.3%2327502,2083665ap1991
Diocese of Mbala-Mpika
Diocese of Mpika
1999169,579650,00026.1%2519443,8542464ap2000
2000105,500550,15019.2%2312353,0143146ap2001
2001108,930543,85720.0%2013333,3002850ap2002
2002111,010451,05224.6%2114353,1712952ap2003
2003113,519471,35224.1%2413373,06829441ap2004
2004128,977494,18726.1%2315383,39430551ap2005
2011126,083504,68325.0%326383,31796514bul:29oct2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 1 Sep 2012