Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sumbawanga

Dioecesis Sumbavangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Damian Kyaruzi, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 24 October 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tabora
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 28,654 (11,067 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 34, Sumbawanga, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (025)2802.178

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Karema
10 May 1946ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tanganika Vicariate Apostolic of Karema (erected)
Diocese of Karema
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Karema Diocese of Karema
Diocese of Sumbawanga
24 October 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Karema Diocese of Sumbawanga
23 October 2000Territory LostDiocese of Sumbawanga Diocese of Mpanda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Karema
195094,40594,446100.0%1724412,3021313ap1951
Diocese of Karema
Diocese of Sumbawanga
1970229,207293,13578.2%4540852,696409825ap1981
1980306,761421,16972.8%6617833,6951712525ap1981
1990485,703694,97469.9%639726,7451025829ap1991
1999812,6381,103,29773.7%6577211,2865730128ap2000
2000527,226603,29187.4%5238905,8584628017ap2001
2001580,000748,82177.5%4655111,3726730022ap2002
2002580,000748,82177.5%4955410,7408230022ap2003
2003593,867928,94163.9%4845211,4206129522ap2004
2004607,143928,94165.4%4945311,4557120822ap2005
2010711,6801,109,76064.1%4775413,1796230723ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 May 2013