Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kasama

Archidioecesis Kasamaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ignatius Chama, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 June 1967
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 59,130 (22,838 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofkasama.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 410143, Kasama, Zambia
  • Telephone: (04)22.12.48
  • Fax: 22.22.02

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo
28 January 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Vicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo (erected)
10 July 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Rosebery (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasama
10 July 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo Vicariate Apostolic of Kasama
Diocese of Kasama
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kasama Diocese of Kasama
Archdiocese of Kasama
12 June 1967ElevatedDiocese of Kasama Archdiocese of Kasama

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo
1950140,117140,117100.0%760672,0917135ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasama
Diocese of Kasama
Archdiocese of Kasama
1970147,480254,00058.1%1145562,6337063ap1971
1980161,000298,00054.0%1032423,833494914ap1981
1990238,475433,59255.0%1934534,499597315ap1991
1999341,500632,39054.0%3521566,098397718ap2000
2000420,000803,00052.3%3918577,368328722ap2001
2001438,350827,09053.0%4219617,1862810322ap2002
2002438,350827,09053.0%4419636,9572810823ap2003
2003448,329877,63051.1%4919686,5932911423ap2004
2004592,8861,038,95457.1%5221738,1213316223ap2005
2006643,0001,063,00060.5%6018788,2435616623ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014