Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zomba

Dioecesis Zombaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Allan Chamgwera, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Blantyre
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malawi
  • Square Kilometers: 3,232 (1,248 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 115, Zomba, Malawi
  • Telephone: 51.53.24
  • Fax: 51.52.47

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba
15 May 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Shiré Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba (erected)
29 April 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Likuni
Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba
Vicariate Apostolic of Dedza (erected)
Diocese of Zomba
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Zomba Diocese of Zomba
29 May 1969Territory LostDiocese of Zomba Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Johnston (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zomba
197094,137512,22818.4%429332,852374511ap1971
1978109,855556,82119.7%1620363,051274713ap1981
1988154,557456,91333.8%2315384,067254713ap1991
1999199,428637,57131.3%339424,748165014ap2000
2000204,742652,53831.4%357424,874155415ap2001
2001206,314652,53831.6%338415,032145215ap2002
2002219,455672,11432.7%328405,486145515ap2003
2003224,003677,80233.0%377445,090126215ap2004
2004229,345685,54133.5%385435,333105915ap2005
2010278,183789,29635.2%4013535,248177115ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013