Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Adrian Chifukwa

Bishop of Dedza, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1973 Born
12 Jan 200430.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dedza, Malawi
12 Jun 200430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dedza, Malawi
8 May 202147.6AppointedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
28 Aug 202148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dedza, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Peter Adrian Chifukwa
Bishop Peter Adrian Chifukwa (born ) Bishop of Dedza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMsampha Village, Diocese of Lilongwe
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Bembeke Demonstration School, Dedza, Diocese of Dedza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dedza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2021
  • bd/mn: CB, 8 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 3 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 20 Jul 2021
  • od/c01: CB, 26 Aug 2021
  • c2: CB, 27 Aug 2021
  • c34: CB, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Aug 2021

Quantcast