Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Mary Benedict Chanche, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1795Born
5 Jun 181923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
15 Dec 184045.1AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
14 Mar 184145.4Ordained BishopBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
22 Jul 185256.7DiedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Mary Benedict Chanche (VIAF: 187153421)
Bishop John Joseph Mary Benedict Chanche P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Natchez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD
Ordained BishopCathedral, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast