Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theophile Meerschaert

Deceased

Bishop of Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1847Born
23 Dec 187124.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 189143.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Indian Territory, Oklahoma, USA
2 Jun 189143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
8 Sep 189144.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
17 Aug 190557.9AppointedBishop of Oklahoma, USA
21 Feb 192476.4DiedBishop of Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Theophile Meerschaert (VIAF: 31238220)
Bishop Theophile Meerschaert (born , died ) Bishop of Oklahoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRussignies, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Natchez, Diocese of Natchez, Mississippi
Death PlaceOklahoma City, Diocese of Oklahoma
Buried Place (Original)Fairlawn, Cemetery, Oklahoma City, Diocese of Oklahoma
Buried Place (Current)Bishops's Vault, Resurrection, Cemetery, Oklahoma City, Diocese of Oklahoma

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017