Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy James Harris

Bishop of Townsville, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1962 Born
18 Nov 199230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
8 Feb 201754.2AppointedBishop of Townsville, Australia
3 May 201754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Townsville, Australia

MicroData Summary for Timothy James Harris
Bishop Timothy James Harris (born ) Bishop of Townsville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane
Ordained PriestCathedral, Brisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane
Ordained BishopEmmaus Hall, Ryan Catholic, College, Kirwan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Townsville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 27 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 May 2017