Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Byrne

Deceased

Bishop of Toowoomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1870BornBallingarry, Ireland
21 Jun 189626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
28 May 192958.9AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
1 Sep 192959.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
11 Feb 193867.6DiedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Byrne:
Bishop James Byrne (born , died ) Bishop of Toowoomba

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013