Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Quinn

Deceased

Bishop of Brisbane, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1819Born
15 Aug 184627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
12 Apr 185940.0AppointedBishop of Brisbane, Australia
29 Jun 185940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brisbane, Australia
12 May 186142.1InstalledBishop of Brisbane, Australia
18 Aug 188162.4DiedBishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Quinn (VIAF: 59954157)
Bishop James Quinn (born , died ) Bishop of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRathbawn or Rathmore, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
Ordained BishopUniversity Church, Stephens Green, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017