Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey Hilton Jarrett

Bishop of Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1937 BornKyneton
9 Nov 196527.9Converted
14 May 197032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hobart, Australia
9 Dec 200063.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lismore, Australia
22 Feb 200163.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lismore, Australia
1 Dec 200164.0SucceededBishop of Lismore, Australia
12 Dec 200164.0InstalledBishop of Lismore, Australia
14 Nov 201174.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brisbane, Australia
2 Apr 201274.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey Hilton Jarrett:
Bishop Geoffrey Hilton Jarrett (born ) Bishop of Lismore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lismore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 14 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013