Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Joseph Kennedy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Armidale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1915BornRozelle
30 Nov 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
14 Sep 196752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
14 Sep 196752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Simingi
23 Nov 196752.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simingi
6 Dec 197156.8AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
26 Apr 199176.1RetiredBishop of Armidale, Australia
2 Sep 200388.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Kennedy
Bishop Henry Joseph Kennedy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Armidale

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016