Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
24 Jul 1958 | Born | ||
1985² | 26.4 | Entered | Member of Society of the Divine Word |
1 Jun 1986 | 27.8 | First Vows | Member of Society of the Divine Word |
1990² | 31.4 | Perpetual Vows | Member of Society of the Divine Word |
2 Mar 1991 | 32.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Society of the Divine Word |
11 Nov 2021 | 63.2 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia |
11 Nov 2021 | 63.2 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Madaurus |
22 Feb 2022 | 63.5 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Madaurus |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney |
Ordained Priest | Eastwood, Archdiocese of Sydney |
Ordained Bishop | St. Stephen’s, Cathedral, Brisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠