Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Pallegoix, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1805BornCombertault, France
31 May 182822.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jun 183832.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
3 Jun 183832.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
3 Jun 183832.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
10 Sep 184135.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand
18 Jun 186256.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Pallegoix:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Pallegoix M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013