Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Champion de Cicé

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Zabulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1648BornBruz, France
19 Jan 170051.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
19 Jan 170051.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabulon
2 Jan 170152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabulon
1 Apr 172778.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Louis Champion de Cicé:
Bishop Louis Champion de Cicé (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013