Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Tessier de Quéralay, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹BornChantenay, France
17 Sep 171749.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
17 Sep 171749.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
1 May 172355.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
1 Apr 172759.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
27 Sep 173668.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Tessier de Quéralay:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Tessier de Quéralay M.E.P. (born 1668, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015