Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chiang Mai

Dioecesis Chiangmaiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 July 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangkok
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 48,013 (18,545 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, 5/3 Charoen Prathet Rd. 12, Chiang Mai 50100, Thailand
  • Telephone: (053)821.063/5
  • Fax: 821.067

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Chieng-Mai
17 November 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Prefecture Apostolic of Chieng-Mai (erected)
Diocese of Chieng-Mai
18 December 1965ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chieng-Mai Diocese of Chieng-Mai
Diocese of Chiang Mai
2 July 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Chieng-Mai Diocese of Chiang Mai
25 April 2018Territory LostDiocese of Chiang Mai Diocese of Chiang Rai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chiang Mai
19705,8072,920,297.2%223252323331ap1971
19809,9424,468,274.2%32326382333518ap1981
199019,1445,118,000.4%82432598355020ap1991
199931,7655,694,679.6%172845705427224ap2000
200034,8485,796,126.6%193049711607925ap2001
200136,5185,796,126.6%2132536896010026ap2002
200238,8945,824,935.7%223860648629726ap2003
200340,5985,824,935.7%2236586996410126ap2004
200441,9445,824,935.7%2238606996111027ap2005
200646,0225,943,000.8%2646726396810932ap2007
201363,2735,826,9281.1%27588574410215145ap2014
201665,8295,853,2061.1%3953927159817047ap2017
201850,9133,025,6491.7%2522471,08310731bul:25Apr2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jul 2018

Quantcast