Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand-Aimé-Augustin-Joseph Dupond, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1809Born
21 Dec 183324.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Sep 186454.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand
9 Sep 186454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
22 Feb 186555.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
11 Dec 187263.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand-Aimé-Augustin-Joseph Dupond
Bishop Ferdinand-Aimé-Augustin-Joseph Dupond M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlers, France

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast