Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph-Louis Coudé, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina

Titular See: (died before consecration)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1750Born
17 Dec 177323.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jan 178231.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
15 Jan 178231.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
8 Jan 178534.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Louis Coudé
Father Joseph-Louis Coudé M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuray, France

  • a priest for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 356, and Page 455
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast