Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kroonstad

Dioecesis Kroonstadensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Holiday, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bloemfontein
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 30,248 (11,683 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: The Peak, P.O. Box 129, Kroonstad 9500, South Africa
  • Telephone: (056)212-6639
  • Fax: 212-7705

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kroonstad
26 November 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kroonstad (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kroonstad
8 April 1935ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kroonstad Vicariate Apostolic of Kroonstad
12 February 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kroonstad Vicariate Apostolic of Bethlehem (erected)
Diocese of Kroonstad
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kroonstad Diocese of Kroonstad

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kroonstad
195010,243190,1745.4%2222465501ap1951
Diocese of Kroonstad
197047,500400,00011.9%120212,261298012ap1971
198073,566600,00012.3%112135,65813203522ap1981
1990102,000879,00011.6%211137,846131325ap1991
199981,180950,0008.5%814223,690121417ap2000
2000107,7551,044,11810.3%415195,671141516ap2001
2001107,755937,52011.5%614205,387131417ap2002
2002107,755937,52011.5%612185,986121219ap2003
2003107,755939,15311.5%514195,671121418ap2004
200486,512940,1539.2%313165,407111313ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012