Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa

Vicariatus Apostolicus Avasanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Migliorati, M.C.C.I., Vicar Apostolic
  • Lorenzo Ceresoli, M.C.C.I., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 15 March 1979
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 75,000 (28,968 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 12, Awassa (SNNPRS) [Sidamo], Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (046)220.23.50
  • Fax: 220.23.48

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli
25 March 1937ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Galla
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaffa
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli (erected)
13 February 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Gimma
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli
Prefecture Apostolic of Hosanna (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Awasa
15 October 1969Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Neghelli Prefecture Apostolic of Awasa
Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa
15 March 1979ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Awasa Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Awasa
19701,0821,465,950.1%881351210ap1971
Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa
198015,9602,366,000.7%2929550413211ap1981
199063,5643,892,0001.6%134351,816415714ap1991
1999121,6374,145,0002.9%938472,588586617ap2000
2000124,8734,820,0002.6%937462,714537317ap2001
2001132,7154,970,0002.7%1040502,654557017ap2002
2002140,1355,320,0002.6%739463,046537017ap2003
2003147,2615,451,0002.7%737443,346467117ap2004
2004157,4175,600,0002.8%1148592,6681567019ap2005
2010190,5756,782,0002.8%1532474,054417119ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 28 Nov 2014