Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ambatondrazaka

Dioecesis AmbatondrazakaŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antoine Scopelliti, O.SS.T., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 21 May 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Toamasina
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 21,436 (8,279 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 33, Ambatondrazaka 503, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)54.810.12

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 May 1959ErectedArchdiocese of Diťgo-Suarez
Archdiocese of Tananarive
Diocese of Ambatondrazaka (erected)
13 May 2006Territory LostDiocese of Ambatondrazaka Diocese of Moramanga (erected)
26 February 2010Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ambatondrazaka (from Antananarivo)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195936,343207,09717.5%16162,27121388ap1960
197054,459300,65518.1%20202,722296910ap1971
198086,000462,00018.6%319223,909299014ap1981
1990152,000726,00020.9%420246,333352315ap1991
1999238,4401,300,00018.3%718259,537338016ap2000
2000242,9401,167,94020.8%1415298,3773011016ap2001
2001251,8501,266,85019.9%924337,6315610515ap2002
2002256,0501,372,05018.7%921308,5354414016ap2003
2003266,0001,400,00019.0%924338,0604014218ap2004
2004271,2751,459,27518.6%1027377,3314514018ap2005
2005330,0001,500,00022.0%1127388,6845115920ap2006
2006220,0001,151,83019.1%621278,148371205ap2007
2012268,1201,411,74019.0%721289,5754314716ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013