Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės

Archidioecesis Tiranensis-Dyrracena



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • George Anthony Frendo, O.P., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 25 January 2005
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Albania
  • Square Kilometers: 2,263 (874 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arqipeshkvia, Bulevardi Zhan d'Ark, Tirane, Shqiperia
  • Telephone: (4)2232.082
  • Fax: 2230.727

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
13th CenturyErectedArchdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo) (erected)
1640Territory AddedDiocese of Albania (suppressed)
Diocese of Mostar (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
Archdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė
23 December 1992UnitedArchdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo) Archdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė
7 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė
Territorial Abbey of Shėn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh) (suppressed)
Diocese of Rrėshen (erected)
Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės
25 January 2005Name ChangedArchdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės ((also became a Metropolitan))

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
195028,8771315281,03120ap1951
Archdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė
199962,000892,0007.0%822302,066258719ap2000
200067,429897,4297.5%826341,9833010318ap2001
2001114,3001,000,00011.4%926353,2653010618ap2002
200296,6451,000,0009.7%1126372,6123110818ap2003
2003119,6141,200,00010.0%1123343,5182710721ap2004
2004105,4001,200,0008.8%228303,5133312321ap2005
Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės
2010130,3801,205,00010.8%930393,3433511819ap2011
2014135,4001,206,00011.2%1029393,4713311019ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.5, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast