Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduard Kava, O.F.M. Conv.

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Cilibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1978 Born
1996²17.7EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 Sep 199719.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Dec 200123.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Jun 200224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Jun 200325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
13 May 201739.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 May 201739.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cilibia
21 Jun 201739.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cilibia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduard Kava
Bishop Eduard Kava O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMostyska, Archdiocese of Lviv
Ordained BishopAssumption of the BVM, Cathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lviv.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2017
  • c1/prof: CB, 13 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 17 May 2017
  • c23: CB, 16 Jun 2017
  • c4: CB, 20 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jun 2017