Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Mahoney

Deceased

Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1875Born
27 Feb 190428.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 192246.8AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
29 Jun 192246.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
20 Mar 193963.6DiedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Mahoney
Bishop Bernard Joseph Mahoney (born , died ) Bishop of Sioux Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbany, NY

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast