Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ermenegildo Cardinal Pellegrinetti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Yugoslavia

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1876Born
24 Sep 189822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
24 May 192246.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
29 May 192246.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
18 Jun 192246.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
13 Dec 193761.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
13 Dec 193761.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Dec 193761.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
29 Mar 194367.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Yugoslavia

MicroData Summary for Ermenegildo Pellegrinetti (VIAF: 51869882)
Ermenegildo Cardinal Pellegrinetti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Yugoslavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamaiore, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
  • a cardinal for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 37
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 May 2018

Quantcast