Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Preti Castriota

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1676³BornBrundusi
18 Apr 172549.1AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
27 May 172549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
1 Dec 174872.8ResignedBishop of Vieste, Italy
10 Jun 175074.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Vieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Preti Castriota:
Bishop Nicola Preti Castriota (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vieste

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015