Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Gori-Mancini, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1653³BornRigomagno
25 Mar 167622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
1 Jun 172269.1AppointedBishop of Malta
7 Jun 172269.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
16 Jul 172774.2DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Gori-Mancini:
Bishop Gaspare Gori-Mancini O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 264
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015