Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giannelli

Deceased

Bishop of Alessano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1660BornVitulano
4 Apr 171151.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Apr 171151.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171857.9AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
16 Jan 171857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
5 Jan 174382.9DiedBishop of Alessano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giannelli:
Bishop Giovanni Giannelli (born , died ) Bishop of Alessano

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015