Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Rossi, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1688BornCapo di Monte
1705¹16.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 May 171123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
11 Apr 173648.0AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
22 Apr 173648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
8 Jul 173749.2AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
21 May 173850.1AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
20 Feb 175061.8DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rossi:
Archbishop Giovanni Rossi C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Taranto

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1749
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 393
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 424

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013