Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bossi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1669BornMilan
10 Jul 171849.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 173162.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
24 Jun 173162.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 Oct 175384.5DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bossi:
Bishop Carlo Bossi (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 442
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013