Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianmaria Capecelatro, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1667Born
31 Mar 169124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
11 Feb 171851.0AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
13 Feb 171851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
8 Dec 173871.8DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianmaria Capecelatro
Bishop Gianmaria Capecelatro C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortici

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast