Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Filomarini, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1667³BornNapoli
23 Sep 169022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Apr 172052.4AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
28 Apr 172052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
Jan 1733³65.1DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Filomarini:
Bishop Domenico Filomarini C.R. (born , died Jan 1733) Bishop of Trevico

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015