Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Luigi Cattani

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1668Born
30 Jan 169425.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 172051.5AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
17 Mar 172051.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
28 Oct 173466.1DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Luigi Cattani
Bishop Andrea Luigi Cattani (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescia

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast