Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Staną (Staria)

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1687Born
26 Mar 171224.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 172234.4AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
7 Jun 172234.4Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
26 Nov 176173.9DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Staną (Staria)
Bishop Silvestro Staną (Staria) (born , died ) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTropea

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1759
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast