Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Berretti

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1686BornCapua
28 Feb 171124.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 172538.3SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
11 Jun 172538.5ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
24 Jun 172538.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
16 Apr 176174.3DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Berretti:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Berretti (born , died ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015